NH HB1804 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 183-110 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 183-110 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to work requirements for able-bodied adults for public assistance programs.
Title
Relative to work requirements for able-bodied adults for public assistance programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 183-110 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 94 |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 43 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-12-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24 |