NH HB1803 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payroll deductions for government employees.
Title
Relative to payroll deductions for government employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Marple [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 23 |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-12-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 24 |