NH HB1792 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Libertarian 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reducing the criminal penalty for certain controlled drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing the criminal penalty for certain controlled drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 22
2018-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 12
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback