NH HB1791 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2018; Chapter 164; I. Sec. 5 eff. 6/7/2018; II. Rem. eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

(New Title ) allowing pharmacists to disclose information relative to lower cost drugs under the managed care law and relative to biological products dispensed by pharmacists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(New Title ) allowing pharmacists to disclose information relative to lower cost drugs under the managed care law and relative to biological products dispensed by pharmacists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1875s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/07/2018; Chapter 164; I. Sec. 5 eff. 6/7/2018; II. Rem. eff. 1/1/2019
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseReconsider concurrence with amendments 1637s and 1875s (Rep. Knirk): Motion Failed Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1637s and 1875s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-1637s and 2018-1875s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1875s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1637s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1637s, 05/03/2018;
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1637s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-26SenateSpecial Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 1791-FN from the Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1637s, 04/26/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/20/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 5
2018-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 5
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-12-05HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback