NH HB179 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of electioneering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of electioneering.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 14
2023-03-16HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/15/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 8
2023-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/07/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-02-01HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Election Law

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback