NH HB1789 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-117 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to costs of requests which are in electronic format under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to costs of requests which are in electronic format under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 213 N: 117 NV: 15 Abs: 47) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-117 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 16
2018-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-07HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 60
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-12-05HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback