NH HB1788 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2018-1406s; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to costs charged under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to costs charged under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenatePending Motion Committee Amendment # 2018-1406s; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1406s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/29/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0451h: Motion Adopted DV 181-149 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 16
2018-03-15HouseAmendment # 2018-0451h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 16
2018-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-07HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0451h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 59
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-12-05HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback