NH HB1784 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to cost comparison for certain health care procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cost comparison for certain health care procedures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18HouseExecutive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
2018-08-22HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building304
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 21
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 11
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-12-04HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback