NH HB1783 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-157 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to newborn screening for Krabbe Leukodystrophy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to newborn screening for Krabbe Leukodystrophy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-157 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 45
2018-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 24
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-23HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/25/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-12-04HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback