NH HB1782 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 94; Eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study insurance payments to ambulance providers and balance billing by ambulance providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study insurance payments to ambulance providers and balance billing by ambulance providers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 94; Eff. 5/25/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/20/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0709h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 20
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0709h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 20
2018-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0709h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 11
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-12-04HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback