NH HB1774 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 202; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 202; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to parenting plans and relocation of a child's residence.
Title
Relative to parenting plans and relocation of a child's residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 202; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0638h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0638h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0638h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-30 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 23 |