NH HB177 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-170 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-170 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of qualified structures under the community revitalization tax relief incentive.
Title
Relative to the definition of qualified structures under the community revitalization tax relief incentive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 194 N: 170 NV: 12 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 194 N: 170 NV: 15 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 194 N: 170 NV: 15 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-170 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 66 |
2023-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB177 02/15/2023 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 18 |
2023-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/16/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-10 | House | Vacated and Referred to Municipal and County Government (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 01/05/2023 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Ways and Means |