NH HB1768 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a cannabis control commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a cannabis control commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16HouseExecutive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204
2018-02-22HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 6
2018-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-4; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-11-27HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback