NH HB1766 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 306; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the department of environmental services to report to the general court regarding bedrock testing and perfluorochemical contamination in the Seacoast area and at other landfills and hazardous waste sites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the department of environmental services to report to the general court regarding bedrock testing and perfluorochemical contamination in the Seacoast area and at other landfills and hazardous waste sites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Floor Amendment (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - Committee Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 207 N: 118 NV: 28 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Interim Study (Y: 149 N: 174 NV: 30 Abs: 38) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 306; Eff. 7/1/2018
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 1983c: Adopted, DV 168-156 05/23/2018
2018-05-23HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Messmer) 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-1983c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-17SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-1983c; 05/17/2018
2018-05-11HouseConference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2018-05-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Avard, Bradley, Fuller Clark; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. John T. O'Connor, Darrow, Pearl, R. Gordon 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1630s and Requests CofC (Rep. John T. O'Connor): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-04-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1630s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Innis Floor Amendment # 2018-1792s, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Amendment Failed; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1630s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1630s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-26SenateHearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-118 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 6
2018-03-07HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 149-174 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 3
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 53
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 303
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-11-22HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2503&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1766
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1523&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1523
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=101&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1766&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1766&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2503
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=102&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1766&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1766&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2503
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=187&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1766&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1766&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2503
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=188&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1766&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1766&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2503
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=189&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1766&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1766&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2503

Bill Comments

feedback