NH HB176 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rules of the site evaluation committee.
Title
Relative to rules of the site evaluation committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
HB176 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36