NH HB1757 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Lay HB 1757 on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Lay HB 1757 on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of a group I retiree's retirement allowance in the retirement system and establishing a post-retirement payment.
Title
Relative to the calculation of a group I retiree's retirement allowance in the retirement system and establishing a post-retirement payment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Lay HB 1757 on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 67 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amendment # 2018-0873h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 65 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0873h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 68 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/28/2018 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/27/2018 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 22 |