NH HB1756 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 304; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a one-time allowance for certain state retirees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a one-time allowance for certain state retirees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Concur (Y: 248 N: 84 NV: 25 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - Table (Y: 149 N: 173 NV: 28 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - ITL (Y: 157 N: 163 NV: 30 Abs: 41) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 304; Eff. 7/1/2018
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2082e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-25SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2082e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1814s (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-84 05/10/2018
2018-04-27SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1814s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2018-1814s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateNo Pending Motion; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-17SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-27SenateHearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-07HouseReconsider HB 1756 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 20
2018-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 20
2018-03-07HouseLay HB 1756 on Table (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 149-173 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 18
2018-03-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 157-163 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 15
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 54
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-02-06HouseDivision I Work Session: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2018-01-18House==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 01/23/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building212
2018-01-11House==RECESSED== Division I Work Session: 01/18/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-11-20HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 1 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2196&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1756
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1209&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&v=HP&id=1209
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1209
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=104&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1756&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1756&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2196
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=105&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1756&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1756&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2196
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=194&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1756&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1756&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2196
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=230&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1756&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1756&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2196

Bill Comments

feedback