NH HB174 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 117; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 117; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the filing of notice of intent to cut timber.
Title
Relative to the filing of notice of intent to cut timber.
Sponsors
Rep. Juliet Harvey-Bolia [R] | Rep. Matthew Simon [R] | Rep. Diane Pauer [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 117; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17 |
2023-06-20 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 14 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0761h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 23 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0761h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 23 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0761h 03/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12 |
2023-02-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |