NH HB1737 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 264-61 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 264-61 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the permissible level of methyl tertiary butyl ether in drinking water.
Title
Relative to the permissible level of methyl tertiary butyl ether in drinking water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 264-61 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 102 |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 46 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 21 |