NH HB1732 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a nursing professionals' health program.
Title
Establishing a nursing professionals' health program.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Scully [R] | Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
Rep. Lisa Freeman [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 40 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 23 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/28/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-21 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-0613h: 02/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 21 |