NH HB172 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB172
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to investigating potential redundancies between the prescription drug affordability board and existing state agency programs regarding prescription drug cost data.
Title
Relative to investigating potential redundancies between the prescription drug affordability board and existing state agency programs regarding prescription drug cost data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB172 (Carry Over) 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36