NH HB1719 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/07/2018; Chapter 16; Eff. 5/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/07/2018; Chapter 16; Eff. 5/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to donations of liquor to nonprofits.
Title
Relative to donations of liquor to nonprofits.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/07/2018; Chapter 16; Eff. 5/7/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1481s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 1 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1481s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1481s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1481s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0405h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0405h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0405h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 10 |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2018 11:35 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 21 |