NH HB1712 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the appeals process for child day care licensees.
Title
Relative to the appeals process for child day care licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4 |
2020-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96270479183 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/16/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0446h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0446h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0446h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 2 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 32 |