NH HB1710 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of the results of child day care monitoring visits.
Title
Relative to the disclosure of the results of child day care monitoring visits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4 |
2020-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2020 10:00 am (following work session) Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96270479183 |
2020-05-07 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/14/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96270479183 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/16/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0469h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0469h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0469h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 2 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-08 | House | Vacated and Referred to Children and Family Law (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 33 |
2020-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 32 |