NH HB1710 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 200-80 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 200-80 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the provision allowing operators to retain a portion of meals and rooms taxes collected and the appropriation of meals and rooms tax revenues to school building aid.
Title
Relative to the provision allowing operators to retain a portion of meals and rooms taxes collected and the appropriation of meals and rooms tax revenues to school building aid.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] |
Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 200-80 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 41 |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-3; Regular Calendar) |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 20 |