NH HB1704 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring court costs and attorneys fees to be paid to the prevailing party.
Title
Requiring court costs and attorneys fees to be paid to the prevailing party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 27 |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 20 |