NH HB1702 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Lay HB 1702 on Table (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted DV 308-15 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Lay HB 1702 on Table (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted DV 308-15 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the management of the Gunstock Area.
Title
Relative to the management of the Gunstock Area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Lay HB 1702 on Table (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted DV 308-15 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 19 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Abear) 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 29 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 20 |