NH HB1699 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a tax on electronic cigarettes.
Title
Relative to a tax on electronic cigarettes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - OTP (Y: 172 N: 142 NV: 50 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Table (Y: 144 N: 185 NV: 35 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - Table (Y: 144 N: 185 NV: 35 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 172-142 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 42 |
2020-03-05 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Burt): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-185 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 42 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 37 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 32 |