NH HB1699 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state representative districts for Hudson and Pelham.
Title
Relative to state representative districts for Hudson and Pelham.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 81 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 40 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 20 |