NH HB1694 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 225-81 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a civics examination as a high school graduation requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring a civics examination as a high school graduation requirement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 225-81 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 62
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 67
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 207
2018-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback