NH HB1692 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a license for mushroom harvesters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a license for mushroom harvesters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-02HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-06-02HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1246h (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 8
2020-05-19HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/94864941825
2020-05-07HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/14/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96270479183
2020-03-04House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2020-03-04House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/16/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 92
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0415h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 92
2020-02-19HouseAmendment # 2020-0415h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 92
2020-02-19HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Spillane) 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0415h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 7
2020-01-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-21HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2020 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 31

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback