NH HB169 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB169
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 286; I. Sec 2 eff. 12/01/2022 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 286; I. Sec 2 eff. 12/01/2022 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the removal of unused utility poles following the transition of equipment, lines, and cables to new utility poles.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the removal of unused utility poles following the transition of equipment, lines, and cables to new utility poles.
Sponsors
Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 286; I. Sec 2 eff. 12/01/2022 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2114EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2114e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1372s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1372s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1372s, 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 11/04/2021 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 15 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/29/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-06-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 06/21/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98681120846 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92874903669 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-11 | House | Vacated and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 01/06/2021 House Journal 2 P. 50 |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 2 P. 37 |
Same As/Similar To
HB169 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304