NH HB169 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 295-73 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 295-73 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring school districts to submit an annual report concerning gifted students.
Title
Requiring school districts to submit an annual report concerning gifted students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 295 N: 73 NV: 15 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 295-73 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 27 |
2019-01-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-01-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 13 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 40 |