NH HB1683 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 45; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of child abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of child abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 45; Eff. 7/14/2018
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 7
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2018 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback