NH HB1680 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a foundation opportunity budget program for funding public education.
Title
Establishing a foundation opportunity budget program for funding public education.
Sponsors
Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Richard Ames [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |