NH HB1680 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Remove from Table (Rep. Murphy): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 149-177 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to abortions after viability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to abortions after viability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 149 N: 177 NV: 35 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - House - Table (Y: 170 N: 163 NV: 21 Abs: 38) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseRemove from Table (Rep. Murphy): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 149-177 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 54
2018-03-21HouseLay HB 1680 on Table (Rep. Eaton): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-163 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 20
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 71
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/31/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback