NH HB168 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB168
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of the New Hampshire fire code.
Title
Relative to the definition of the New Hampshire fire code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-11-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-09-05 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-22 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-22 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-02 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/23/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB168 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass