NH HB168 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 308-35; House Journal 16, PG.316-318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing the beer tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the beer tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-06 - House - ITL (Y: 308 N: 35 NV: 31 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 308-35; House Journal 16, PG.316-318
2013-01-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 11, PG.157
2013-01-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 6 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.157
2013-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2013-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 1/23/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.185

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback