NH HB1676 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/23/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/23/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to making incentive grants for school districts that improve in certain assessment scores.
Title
Relative to making incentive grants for school districts that improve in certain assessment scores.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/23/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 08:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |