NH HB1675 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to state house Internet service and relative to calendars and journals of the house and senate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state house Internet service and relative to calendars and journals of the house and senate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-29SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-21SenateHearing: 03/29/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Rules and Enrolled Bills; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 9
2018-01-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 12
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 104
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback