NH HB1665 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Public Hearing: 01/24/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a municipal road and bridge disaster relief fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a municipal road and bridge disaster relief fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303
2022-01-12HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2021-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback