NH HB1665 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 198-135 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing an independent advisory commission on redistricting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an independent advisory commission on redistricting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 342 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2020-06-29 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 121 NV: 22 Abs: 50) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseVeto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 198-135 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
2020-08-12HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 07/31/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 06/29/2020; Senate Calendar 25
2020-06-19Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_PTTnQnIkQP-k8rHDlcyGiw Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate5. Webinar ID: 917 7748 7582 Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,91777487582# or 19292056099,,91777487582# Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799, or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateRemote Hearing: 06/25/2020, 01:35 pm; Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-18SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2020-03-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0899h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-121 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 75
2020-03-12HouseAmendment # 2020-0899h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 75
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0899h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 53
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2020 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 (or at session lunch break)
2020-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-12-18HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 31

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2405&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1665
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1512&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1512
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&v=SP&id=1512
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=120&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1665&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1665&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2405
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=91&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1665&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1665&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2405
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=221&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1665&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1665&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2405

Bill Comments

feedback