NH HB1661 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 272; I. Sections 1-5 7-9 12 21 22 28 34 58 59 & 61 eff 07/01/2022 II. Sections 23 29 70-74 & 76-79 eff. 08/23/2022 III. Sections 6 31-33 eff. 6/30/2022 IV.Sections 13 14 68 $ 75 eff 01/01/2023 V. Sectioins 63-67 eff. 07/24/2022 VI. Rem eff. 6/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 272; I. Sections 1-5 7-9 12 21 22 28 34 58 59 & 61 eff 07/01/2022 II. Sections 23 29 70-74 & 76-79 eff. 08/23/2022 III. Sections 6 31-33 eff. 6/30/2022 IV.Sections 13 14 68 $ 75 eff 01/01/2023 V. Sectioins 63-67 eff. 07/24/2022 VI. Rem eff. 6/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regional career technical education agreements, an appropriation for preliminary work for a new legislative parking garage, health and human services, establishing an extraordinary need grant for schools, training and procedures for zoning and planning boards, and financial investments and incentives for affordable housing development.
Title
Relative to regional career technical education agreements, an appropriation for preliminary work for a new legislative parking garage, health and human services, establishing an extraordinary need grant for schools, training and procedures for zoning and planning boards, and financial investments and incentives for affordable housing development.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Bob Lynn [R] |
Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 244 N: 99 NV: 18 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 271 N: 65 NV: 21 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 271 N: 65 NV: 21 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 272; I. Sections 1-5 7-9 12 21 22 28 34 58 59 & 61 eff 07/01/2022 II. Sections 23 29 70-74 & 76-79 eff. 08/23/2022 III. Sections 6 31-33 eff. 6/30/2022 IV.Sections 13 14 68 $ 75 eff 01/01/2023 V. Sectioins 63-67 eff. 07/24/2022 VI. Rem eff. 6/24/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2111e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2111e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2088c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 244-99 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Lay HB1661 on Table (Rep. Ankarberg): Motion Failed DV 99-243 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2088c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2088c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Packard Replaces Rep. Turcotte 05/19/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/19/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-05-18 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/18/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-05-16 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-05-13 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Cordelli Replaces Rep. Edwards 05/13/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/13/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Hennessey, D'Allesandro; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1960s 2022-1973s 2022-1976s 2022-1966s 2022-1659s and Requests CofC (Reps. Ladd, Umberger, Edwards, Turcotte): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1966s, 2022-1976s; 2022-1973s, and 2022-1960s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-1960s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-1973s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-1976s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-1966s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Special Order to after the Bills removed from the Consent Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1659s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1659s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1659s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 04/19/2022, Room 103, State House, 12:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Amendment # 2022-1475s to HB 1661 will be proposed; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Capital Budget; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1173h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-1173h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 271-65 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1173h (NT) (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-21 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 03/21/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 03/21/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-18 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2022-111h: 03/21/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/21/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/15/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2022-0356h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0356h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0356h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |