NH HB1661 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Enrolled 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a marriage petition by a party under age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a marriage petition by a party under age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled 05/03/2018
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-04-26HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1403s (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1403s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1403s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1403s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-29SenateHearing: 04/03/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0461h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 6
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0461h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 6
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0461h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-31House==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-29House==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-24House==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback