NH HB1660 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Reconsider HB1660 (Rep. B. Nelson): Motion Failed DV 176-179 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Reconsider HB1660 (Rep. B. Nelson): Motion Failed DV 176-179 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school lunches and establishing the meals for students fund.
Title
Relative to school lunches and establishing the meals for students fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Reconsider HB1660 (Rep. B. Nelson): Motion Failed DV 176-179 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 177-174 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |