NH HB166 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB166
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-160 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-160 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to safety requirements for pools on foreclosed residential property.
Title
Relative to safety requirements for pools on foreclosed residential property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-05 - House - ITL (Y: 186 N: 160 NV: 23 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-160 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB166 10/29/2021 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 20 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-06 | House | Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 01:35 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94408830780 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following linksTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98678901926 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 37 |
Same As/Similar To
HB166 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308