NH HB1659 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 85; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 85; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal history background checks for certain health care workers.
Title
Relative to criminal history background checks for certain health care workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 85; Eff. 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/16/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2022-0532h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0532h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0532h (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2022 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |