NH HB1659 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-143 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study possible health and safety impacts of the alkali-silica reaction on the seacoast.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study possible health and safety impacts of the alkali-silica reaction on the seacoast.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 143 NV: 17 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-143 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 34
2018-02-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-02-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 19
2018-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback