NH HB1658 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to developing a notification database for those individuals with orders of commitment or revocations of conditional discharges.
Title
Relative to developing a notification database for those individuals with orders of commitment or revocations of conditional discharges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 5 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/12/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/08/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 28 |