NH HB1656 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the assertion of civil claims, cross claims, or counter claims in civil cases.
Title
Relative to the assertion of civil claims, cross claims, or counter claims in civil cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 26 |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 18 |